TN SB1408 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the governing boards of institutions of higher education must make a report on any program terminations to the education committee of the senate and education administration and planning committee of the house of representatives by July 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, specifies that the governing boards of institutions of higher education must make a report on any program terminations to the education committee of the senate and education administration and planning committee of the house of representatives by July 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1235 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning