TN SB1407 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes permanent the removal of the cap on the amount of state shared sales tax revenue remitted to premiere type tourist resort municipalities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to premiere type tourist resort municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0678 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee