TN SB1407 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, limits the authority of a community oversight board to the review and consideration of matters reported to it and the issuance of advisory reports and recommendations to agencies involved in public safety and the administration of justice. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, limits the authority of a community oversight board to the review and consideration of matters reported to it and the issuance of advisory reports and recommendations to agencies involved in public safety and the administration of justice. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-03-04SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0658 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4, PNV 2

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback