TN SB1407 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, changes the time period a local board of education has to deny or approve a sponsor's amended application from 30 days to 60 days; changes the time period in which the amended application will be deemed approved if the local board of education fails to deny or approve the amended application from 30 days to 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, changes the time period a local board of education has to deny or approve a sponsor's amended application from 30 days to 60 days; changes the time period in which the amended application will be deemed approved if the local board of education fails to deny or approve the amended application from 30 days to 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Pub. Ch. 698
2018-04-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-04-12SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-29SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-29HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-29HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 1, PNV 0
2018-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0913)
2018-03-29HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-26SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-03-26SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0881)
2018-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
2018-03-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
2018-03-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
2017-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1237 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 698

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback