TN SB1403 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel motel tax from the amount of five percent to the amount of seven percent; requires revenues generated from such increase to be used solely to promote tourism in the county. - Amends amend Chapter 15 of the Private Acts of 1995.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel motel tax from the amount of five percent to the amount of seven percent; requires revenues generated from such increase to be used solely to promote tourism in the county. - Amends amend Chapter 15 of the Private Acts of 1995.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14 | |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1380 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 14