TN SB1401 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows an age-restricted venue to continue to permit smoking in the venue even if the venue employs a person under 21 years of age if the employee is at least 16 years of age, the child of the owner of the venue, and the venue is not an adult-oriented establishment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 18, relative to the employment of minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415 | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0926 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021