TN SB1400 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding mileage allowance and expense allowances.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 3-1-106, relative to members of the general assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 570 | |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 4-13-21 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1401 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 11/08/2022