TN SB1399 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 427
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 427
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes appropriations for fiscal years beginning July 1, 2014, and July 1, 2015.
Title
As enacted, makes appropriations for fiscal years beginning July 1, 2014, and July 1, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 0, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 427 | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-26 | Senate | R/S Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-26 | Senate | R/S Recalled from Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 427