TN SB1398 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires LEAs to provide students and parents of students enrolled in grades 9-12 with certain information regarding college and career experiences. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires LEAs to provide students and parents of students enrolled in grades 9-12 with certain information regarding college and career experiences. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 274 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0374) |
2019-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0147) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 274