TN SB1395 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a program managed by the commissioner of commerce and insurance to annually award grants to volunteer fire departments for the purchase of firefighting equipment or to meet local match requirements for federal grants for the purchase of firefighting equipment and training. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a program managed by the commissioner of commerce and insurance to annually award grants to volunteer fire departments for the purchase of firefighting equipment or to meet local match requirements for federal grants for the purchase of firefighting equipment and training. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 497
2019-05-01SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-01SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0518 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 497

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback