TN SB1394 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of mental health and substance abuse services to make available on its public website an electronic copy of the written minutes of each meeting of the Tennessee opioid abatement council. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the treatment of opioid abuse disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1227 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.