TN SB1393 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a hospital or healthcare provider to charge, in response to a request for copies of records for an individual to appeal a denial of social security disability insurance or supplemental security income, a patient, patient representative, or other person authorized by the patient the reimbursement amount that disability determination services reimburses the hospital or provider for such records pursuant to federal social security administration medical record payment rates; prohibits a hospital or provider from charging a search fee if no records are located in response to the request. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, relative to medical records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1071 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback