TN SB1393 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that it is a violation of the Consumer Protection Act of 1977 to offer, through the mail or by other means, the provision of a warranty for a motor vehicle in a manner that is likely to cause the owner of the motor vehicle to believe that the offer originated from the manufacturer of the motor vehicle or from the dealer that sold the motor vehicle to the owner. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, provides that it is a violation of the Consumer Protection Act of 1977 to offer, through the mail or by other means, the provision of a warranty for a motor vehicle in a manner that is likely to cause the owner of the motor vehicle to believe that the offer originated from the manufacturer of the motor vehicle or from the dealer that sold the motor vehicle to the owner. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0755 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-08 - Reset on Final cal. of Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee