TN SB1391 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from February 15 to March 1 the date by which the commissioner of education must submit an annual report summarizing conflict resolution intervention programs to the governor and the education committees of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes from February 15 to March 1 the date by which the commissioner of education must submit an annual report summarizing conflict resolution intervention programs to the governor and the education committees of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1239 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs