TN SB1391 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 820
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 820
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a woman may be prosecuted for assault for the illegal use of a narcotic drug while pregnant, if her child is born addicted to or harmed by the narcotic drug; law expires July 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, provides that a woman may be prosecuted for assault for the illegal use of a narcotic drug while pregnant, if her child is born addicted to or harmed by the narcotic drug; law expires July 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 820 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Governor returned. |
2014-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 64, Nays 30, PNV 1 |
2014-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 7 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0858) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1295 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 820