TN SB1390 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds as requirements for sale of Kratom that sales only be made by retailers and sold only in packaging of five ounces to seven ounces; violation is a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4, relative to Kratom.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1493 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee