TN SB1390 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires state government agencies and departments to provide notice to legislators of proposed contracts that will outsource professional facilities management services within such legislators' districts; revises other reporting and other requirements relative to state government. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 41; Title 50 and Title 54.
Title
As enacted, requires state government agencies and departments to provide notice to legislators of proposed contracts that will outsource professional facilities management services within such legislators' districts; revises other reporting and other requirements relative to state government. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 41; Title 50 and Title 54.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5-9-17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0975 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 469