TN SB1388 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a declarant or someone acting on a declarant's behalf to deliver a copy of a living will to the attending physician or other concerned healthcare provider by electronic means. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 32; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, allows a declarant or someone acting on a declarant's behalf to deliver a copy of a living will to the attending physician or other concerned healthcare provider by electronic means. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 32; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1338 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1388&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1388.pdf |