TN SB1386 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to develop an evidence-based training program on adverse childhood experiences (ACEs) for school leaders and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to develop an evidence-based training program on adverse childhood experiences (ACEs) for school leaders and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 723 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0978) |
2018-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0882) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1240 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723