TN SB1384 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of health, by January 1, 2020, to: study instances when co-prescribing of naloxone with an opioid is beneficial and publish the results to each prescribing board that licenses healthcare professionals who can legally prescribe controlled substances and the board of pharmacy; and include the findings in the treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of health, by January 1, 2020, to: study instances when co-prescribing of naloxone with an opioid is beneficial and publish the results to each prescribing board that licenses healthcare professionals who can legally prescribe controlled substances and the board of pharmacy; and include the findings in the treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327 | |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1360 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 327