TN SB1380 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires law enforcement agencies to develop certain policies regarding the use of force; prohibits magistrates from issuing no-knock warrants; establishes certain reporting requirements. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 489 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2021-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0423) |
2021-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0325) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1406 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489