TN SB1379 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a financial institution from releasing or providing the account balance or transaction activity of an account to a person without first obtaining the account holder's express permission or without a warrant issued by a judicial officer located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to financial institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0965 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.