TN SB1376 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a marriage license may not be issued for an applicant under 17 years of age; defines "parent" for purposes of parental consent to marriage of a minor; deletes obsolete requirement that marriage license application of a minor be mailed to the minor's parent and held for three days before issuance of license. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that a marriage license may not be issued for an applicant under 17 years of age; defines "parent" for purposes of parental consent to marriage of a minor; deletes obsolete requirement that marriage license application of a minor be mailed to the minor's parent and held for three days before issuance of license. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0189 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Signed by H. Speaker

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback