TN SB1375 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 925
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 925
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing qualification of additional candidates in a primary election or nonpartisan general election after the qualifying deadline due to death, withdrawal, or disqualification of a qualified candidate leaving no candidates for nomination or office. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 16; Title 17; Title 27 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 16; Title 17; Title 27 and Title 29, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 925 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 3/22/22 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1125 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2022