TN SB1374 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to allocate to each local education agency (LEA) sufficient funds for the LEA to employ one full-time public school nurse for every 750 students enrolled in the LEA, or one full-time public school nurse for the LEA, whichever is greater. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 12, relative to education funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0423 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback