TN SB1374 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the annual report of the Greater Nashville regional council to be submitted on or before February 1 each year. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 42 and Title 64.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 42 and Title 64, relative to regional authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1270 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.