TN SB1374 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits correctional officers and certain other people employed by the department of correction to carry a handgun the same as a law enforcement officer if they have completed their probationary period rather than when they are vested. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1350.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits correctional officers and certain other people employed by the department of correction to carry a handgun the same as a law enforcement officer if they have completed their probationary period rather than when they are vested. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1350.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-03-14SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0109 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback