TN SB1373 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, classifies the offense of reckless endangerment by discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle as a Class C felony. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 505
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-05HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-05HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0268)
2021-05-05HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-05SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 1
2021-05-05SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0394)
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1433 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback