TN SB1373 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits use of state funds for registration fees to, and for travel to or from, conferences, symposiums, and workshops beginning May 1, 2017; requires disclosure of travel expenses paid by certain national organizations. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 13 and Title 3, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, prohibits use of state funds for registration fees to, and for travel to or from, conferences, symposiums, and workshops beginning May 1, 2017; requires disclosure of travel expenses paid by certain national organizations. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 13 and Title 3, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1363 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee