TN SB1368 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a county board of health or county department of health from prohibiting or regulating agriculture except as otherwise authorized by law. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 2, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 2, Part 6, relative to local health services.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2021 | |
2021-04-12 | Pub. Ch. 106 | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0036) |
2021-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0052) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1163 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 106