TN SB1367 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Accommodations for All Children Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the Tennessee Accommodations for All Children Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 452
2021-04-21SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-05SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021
2021-03-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1233 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 452

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback