TN SB1364 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes permanent the provision that is set to expire July 1, 2019, allowing counties to provide 2 percent matching funds for state-aid highway funds rather than 25 percent. - Amends TCA Section 54-4-404.
Title
As enacted, makes permanent the provision that is set to expire July 1, 2019, allowing counties to provide 2 percent matching funds for state-aid highway funds rather than 25 percent. - Amends TCA Section 54-4-404.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 129 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0531 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 129