TN SB1364 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes psychologists licensed in this state to provide impairment ratings for mental injuries in workers' compensation cases; creates certain penalties for noncompliance of certain workers' compensation coverage by construction services providers. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes psychologists licensed in this state to provide impairment ratings for mental injuries in workers' compensation cases; creates certain penalties for noncompliance of certain workers' compensation coverage by construction services providers. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1102 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1364&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1364.pdf |