TN SB1363 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the establishment of a three-judge panel to adjudicate cases challenging state legislative or congressional districts. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3; Title 2; Title 3; Title 16; Title 17; Title 20; Title 27 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 1, Chapter 3; Title 2; Title 3; Title 16; Title 17; Title 20; Title 27 and Title 29, relative to three-judge panels.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1436 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-19 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration