TN SB1358 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from January 15 to January 1, the date by which the commission must submit its annual report regarding state workforce need projections and credential production to the education and commerce and labor committees of the senate, the education administration and planning and business and utilities committees of the house of representatives, the governor, the board of regents, the University of Tennessee board of trustees, and the Tennessee Independent Colleges and Universities Association. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes from January 15 to January 1, the date by which the commission must submit its annual report regarding state workforce need projections and credential production to the education and commerce and labor committees of the senate, the education administration and planning and business and utilities committees of the house of representatives, the governor, the board of regents, the University of Tennessee board of trustees, and the Tennessee Independent Colleges and Universities Association. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1399 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning