TN SB1357 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the board to promulgate rules allowing a local board of education to meet the 180-day classroom instruction requirement by providing a minimum number of instructional hours per year. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.
Title
As introduced, requires the board to promulgate rules allowing a local board of education to meet the 180-day classroom instruction requirement by providing a minimum number of instructional hours per year. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0811 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs