TN SB1351 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allocates state sales and use tax revenues from the construction of a uranium processing facility to an eligible industrial development corporation that submits a completed application to the commissioner of finance and administration together with an application fee in an amount established by the department; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allocates state sales and use tax revenues from the construction of a uranium processing facility to an eligible industrial development corporation that submits a completed application to the commissioner of finance and administration together with an application fee in an amount established by the department; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-02SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1359 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/23/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback