TN SB1349 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines the term "intellectual disability" for purposes of determining eligibility for the death penalty; allows certain defendants sentenced to death prior to the effective date of this act to petition the trial court for a determination as to whether the defendant is intellectually disabled. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the death penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399 | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1062 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021