TN SB1348 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 385
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes certain municipality located in a tier 3 enhancement county, acting through the authorization of the board of public utilities or other board or supervisory body having responsibility for the gas department or electric department, to loan funds from the gas department or electric department to an eligible industrial development corporation for the purpose of economic development or industrial development, or both, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes certain municipality located in a tier 3 enhancement county, acting through the authorization of the board of public utilities or other board or supervisory body having responsibility for the gas department or electric department, to loan funds from the gas department or electric department to an eligible industrial development corporation for the purpose of economic development or industrial development, or both, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-03 Pub. Ch. 385
2011-06-03 Effective date(s) 06/01/11
2011-06-01 Signed by Governor.
2011-05-27 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-05-26 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-05-25 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-05-25 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-05-20 Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
2011-05-20 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0499)
2011-05-20 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0268)
2011-05-20 Subst. for comp. HB.
2011-05-20 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-05-20 Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2011-05-20 S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0497)
2011-05-19 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/20/2011
2011-05-19 S. Reset on cal. for 5/20/2011
2011-05-17 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/19/2011
2011-05-17 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-05-11 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/17/2011
2011-05-10 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2011-05-10 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011
2011-05-09 R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Gov. Comm. 5/10/11
2011-05-03 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/10/2011
2011-05-02 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011
2011-05-02 R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&LGov. Comm. 5/3/11
2011-05-02 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/10/2011
2011-04-26 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/2/2011
2011-04-26 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/3/2011
2011-04-20 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011
2011-02-24 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2011-02-23 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-17 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1653 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback