TN SB1346 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that personally identifying information contained in motor vehicle accident reports be treated as confidential information and restricted from public disclosure; creates exceptions; revises other provisions governing motor vehicle accident reports. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that personally identifying information contained in motor vehicle accident reports be treated as confidential information and restricted from public disclosure; creates exceptions; revises other provisions governing motor vehicle accident reports. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Pub. Ch. 111
2019-04-15 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-01HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 1
2019-04-01HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0220)
2019-04-01HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0165)
2019-04-01HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-25HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0115)
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-18SenateRefer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-18SenateRecalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-03-12SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1107 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 111

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback