TN SB1343 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines "minor" to mean a person less than 21 years of age for the purpose of determining the legal age to purchase or own a firearm, unless the person is a military service member or honorably discharged or retired veteran at which point the person may be 18 years of age or older to purchase or own a firearm; makes it a Class A misdemeanor for a minor to purchase or own a firearm or for a person to sell, loan, or gift a firearm to a person younger than 21 years of age if the person is not a military service member or veteran. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1466 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2024