TN SB1342 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises provisions governing blood and breath tests for determining the presence of drugs and alcohol. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises provisions governing blood and breath tests for determining the presence of drugs and alcohol. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-09SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-08HousePassed H., Ayes 81, Nays 8, PNV 1
2019-04-08HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 2
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0761 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback