TN SB1341 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the domestic violence coordinating council, in coordination with the administrative office of the courts, to revise the affidavit of firearms dispossession form to require only a signature from a defendant convicted of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the domestic violence coordinating council, in coordination with the administrative office of the courts, to revise the affidavit of firearms dispossession form to require only a signature from a defendant convicted of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1295 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback