TN SB1341 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the domestic violence coordinating council, in coordination with the administrative office of the courts, to revise the affidavit of firearms dispossession form to require only a signature from a defendant convicted of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111.
Title
As introduced, requires the domestic violence coordinating council, in coordination with the administrative office of the courts, to revise the affidavit of firearms dispossession form to require only a signature from a defendant convicted of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1295 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration