TN SB1340 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions concerning judicial commitment of certain persons in the custody of the department of correction. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions concerning judicial commitment of certain persons in the custody of the department of correction. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1498 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 504