TN SB1339 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires bail bondsmen to not have been convicted of two Class A or B misdemeanors or their equivalent within five years of applying for a license. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-125.
Title
As enacted, requires bail bondsmen to not have been convicted of two Class A or B misdemeanors or their equivalent within five years of applying for a license. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-125.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0947 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 169