TN SB1331 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a governing body to provide members of the public the opportunity to comment at a meeting of the governing body if the meeting is open to the public pursuant to the Open Meetings Law and if members of the public give proper notice to the governing body. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 44 and Title 49, relative to open meetings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1124 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback