TN SB1330 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes amusement tax on dues or fees to membership sports and recreation clubs. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, removes amusement tax on dues or fees to membership sports and recreation clubs. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1452 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee