TN SB1324 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "guardian" or "legal guardian" as "a person having the legal authority to provide for the care, supervision, and control of a minor child as established by law or court order" for purposes of criminal injuries compensation. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, defines "guardian" or "legal guardian" as "a person having the legal authority to provide for the care, supervision, and control of a minor child as established by law or court order" for purposes of criminal injuries compensation. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 311 | |
2019-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0349) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0208) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0864 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 311