TN SB1323 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TACIR to conduct a comprehensive evaluation of childhood obesity in the state and its short- and long-term effects. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 43; Title 47; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 43; Title 47; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to childhood health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 503 | |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Health & Welfare Committee 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503